IN HB1210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Representative Gutwein added as coauthor
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Representative Gutwein added as coauthor
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal assistance and federal grant administration. Provides that after June 30, 2019, a state agency may not apply for or renew federal assistance or a federal grant (assistance or grant) unless: (1) the state agency analyzes the effect of the assistance or grant on state and local governments and private sector entities; (2) the Indiana office of state based initiatives (office) makes a recommendation based upon the agency's analysis regarding whether to pursue the assistance or grant; (3) the governor approves the assistance or grant. Provides that if the assistance or grant requires any expenditure of state funds, for fiscal years after June 30, 2021, the general assembly must make a specific appropriation of the funds in the state budget. Requires the office in cooperation with the state budget agency to present certain budgetary information on assistance and grants to the interim study committee on fiscal policy and the state budget committee before November 1 of each even-numbered year. Requires the interim study committee on fiscal policy and the state budget committee to review the federal grant information presented by the office. Requires the office in cooperation with the state budget agency to provide information regarding assistance and grants expiring in fiscal years 2020 and 2021 to the interim study committee on fiscal policy and the state budget committee.
Title
Federal assistance and federal grant administration. Provides that after June 30, 2019, a state agency may not apply for or renew federal assistance or a federal grant (assistance or grant) unless: (1) the state agency analyzes the effect of the assistance or grant on state and local governments and private sector entities; (2) the Indiana office of state based initiatives (office) makes a recommendation based upon the agency's analysis regarding whether to pursue the assistance or grant; (3) the governor approves the assistance or grant. Provides that if the assistance or grant requires any expenditure of state funds, for fiscal years after June 30, 2021, the general assembly must make a specific appropriation of the funds in the state budget. Requires the office in cooperation with the state budget agency to present certain budgetary information on assistance and grants to the interim study committee on fiscal policy and the state budget committee before November 1 of each even-numbered year. Requires the interim study committee on fiscal policy and the state budget committee to review the federal grant information presented by the office. Requires the office in cooperation with the state budget agency to provide information regarding assistance and grants expiring in fiscal years 2020 and 2021 to the interim study committee on fiscal policy and the state budget committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Representative Gutwein added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2019-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2019-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Stutzman |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1210/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/d/f/93df2ccc/HB1210.01.INTR.pdf |