IN HB1209 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a tax credit against state tax liability to a small business for hiring a sufficient number of new employees after December 31, 2013, and before January 1, 2017: (1) who are receiving unemployment benefits or have exhausted their unemployment benefits; or (2) who are former members of the armed services of the United States or the National Guard.
Title
Tax credit for hiring new employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Moed. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1209/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/7/a/0e7a11ae/HB1209.01.INTR.pdf |