IN HB1204 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that if the parent, guardian, or court appointed special guardian of a child enrolled in a school requests a health care provider to disclose certain mental health information to the child's school, the health care provider shall provide the child's school the information. Prescribes the manner in which the information must be released and requires a principal or school leader to sign a confidentiality agreement concerning the release of the information. Prohibits a superintendent or school leader from excusing or excluding a student who was found to be mentally or physically unfit for school attendance if a physician, psychologist, or psychiatrist certifies that the student is fit for school attendance. Provides that the witness fee for an employee of a school district is $100. Provides civil immunity for a school, school employee, or school board for civil damages that are the result of: (1) an injury to a child or family members of a child if the injury is the result of a student's mental health issue that has not been disclosed to the school by the student's parent or guardian; or (2) referrals the school made or services the school offered concerning evaluations or treatment of the student's health.
Title
Various education and school matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Kreg Battles [D] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Dan Forestal [D] |
Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 22 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 120403 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 120401 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 22 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 120403 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 120401 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | Public Law 41 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 424: yeas 45 and nays 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 464: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Broden added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Errington added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Forestal added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Washburne added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative DeVon added as advisor |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Battles added as conferee |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative Huston added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 310: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1204 Amendment #2 (Kruse), failed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1204 Amendment #3 (Taylor), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1204 Amendment #1 (Yoder), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Broden added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added second sponsor. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 186: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative Forestal added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Representative DeVon added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | House | HB 1204 Amendment #1 (Forestal), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Battles added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Huston. |