IN HB1203 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various department of health matters. Provides that the state department of health (department) may officially be known as the Indiana department of health. Removes by July 1, 2022, appeals panels from the appeals process of department orders. Provides that the executive board or the department's designee may act as the ultimate authority for department matters under the administrative and procedures laws. Provides that the state health commissioner (commissioner) is the appointing authority and director of the department. Provides that any physicians employed by the department are governed by the state ethics commission's conflict of interest requirements. Allows the commissioner to designate in writing employees in the department who are licensed as a physician and may engage in the practice of medicine outside of their official duties. Provides that the state is not liable for any act performed by a physician employed by the department for any medical care provided to a patient by the physician that is provided in an individual capacity as a licensed physician. Removes the executive board of the department from determining the commissioner's salary. Provides that the commissioner's salary is determined by the governor and the state budget agency. Removes the executive board's approval for the commissioner to organize the personnel and functions of the department into divisions and subdivisions. Specifies that the state department of health may release certain information to an Indiana nonprofit entity that performs health data services for health care providers if specified conditions are met. Extends the expiration of the syringe exchange program until July 1, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various department of health matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HousePublic Law 130
2021-04-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 396: yeas 77, nays 3
2021-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-01SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-01SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 35, nays 15
2021-03-29SenateAmendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-29SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-18SenatePlaced back on second reading
2021-03-18SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11SenateSenator Yoder added as cosponsor
2021-03-11SenateSenator Becker added as third sponsor
2021-03-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 93, nays 1
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives Ledbetter C and Fleming added as coauthors
2021-02-01HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Davisson and Clere
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1203/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/1/d/041d7410/HB1203.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/d/d/b7ddf825/HB1203.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/6/b/c56bb03a/HB1203.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/3/0/a630bd87/HB1203.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/f/4/06f44f41/HB1203.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/5/2/4b52f684/HB1203.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/4/d/594d8f43/HB1203.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/2/3/d023759c/HB1203.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/5/b/905b48a8/HB1203.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/b/7/b3b7e7bf/HB1203.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/8/6/33864a2a/HB1203.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/f/6/bbf61c4e/HB1203.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/9/1/31919698/HB1203.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/c/e/0fceb264/HB1203.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/1/c/d11c8f81/HB1203.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/0/8/9b08bc0c/HB1203.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/c/f/0fcff3e4/HB1203.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/f/e/55fec633/HB1203.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/7/a/167ac54b/HB1203.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/8/4/7384042c/HB1203.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/6/a/b36aa907/HB1203.04.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/b/d/2abd6505/HB1203.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/a/8/aca842fc/HB1203.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/2/4/4d24b7f9/HB1203.46_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/7/4/b974efa6/HB1203.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/e/b/f5ebee4f/HB1203.290_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/e/d/28ed4ace/HB1203.396_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback