IN HB1201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Companion animal sterilization. Authorizes the board of animal health to establish a registry of animal care facilities. Requires that beginning July 1, 2021, a dog or a cat in an animal care facility must be spayed or neutered before adoption from the facility. Defines "animal care facility" as an animal control center, an animal shelter, a humane society, or another animal impounding facility that has as its purpose the humane treatment of animals and that has dogs or cats that are available for adoption, including governmental and private entities and animal rescues. Exempts certain cats and dogs from the spay
Title
Companion animal sterilization. Authorizes the board of animal health to establish a registry of animal care facilities. Requires that beginning July 1, 2021, a dog or a cat in an animal care facility must be spayed or neutered before adoption from the facility. Defines "animal care facility" as an animal control center, an animal shelter, a humane society, or another animal impounding facility that has as its purpose the humane treatment of animals and that has dogs or cats that are available for adoption, including governmental and private entities and animal rescues. Exempts certain cats and dogs from the spay
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Public Law 201 |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-25 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-02-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 248: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-21 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Stoops |
2016-01-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman, Grooms, Arnold |
2016-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 29: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Lawson L, Truitt and Wright |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |