IN HB1201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that after March 31, 2012, the I- Light communications network may not be used to offer or provide, directly or indirectly, communications service to the public or to any private or governmental entity. Provides exceptions to this prohibition to allow for the following: (1) The provision of communications service for 911 services or emergency or law enforcement purposes. (2) The provision of communications service to institutions of higher education in furtherance of education or research for the direct benefit of students, faculty, or staff, and, under certain conditions, to other persons with a research and development relationship with the institution. (3) The provision of communications service for the direct benefit of public broadcasting. Provides that after March 31, 2012, a person that is not: (1) a state educational institution; or (2) a private postsecondary educational institution; may not become a member of the I-Light network or otherwise connect to or use the I-Light network or any services made available through I-Light.
Title
State provision and use of communications service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Pierce), failed (Y: 29 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Pierce), failed (Y: 29 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 338: yeas 71, nays 22 | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2012-01-27 | Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Merritt and Randolph | |
2012-01-27 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 71, nays 20 | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 3 (Pierce), failed; Roll Call 61: yeas 29, nays 66 | |
2012-01-26 | Amendment 1 (Truitt), failed; Division of the House: yeas 32, nays 50 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Dermody |