IN HB1201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to the adoption laws regarding the release of identifying and nonidentifying information. Establishes requirements regarding requests for information concerning pre-adoptive siblings and conforms those requirements with laws concerning the release of identifying information. Requires the department of child services, a county office of family and children, a licensed child placing agency, a professional health care provider, an attorney, and a court to send a copy of a written consent, any signed writing that withdraws or modifies a consent to the release of identifying information, and a written nonrelease form to the state registrar. Requires the department of child services to provide, at least one time each month, to the state department of health a list certain children whose birth parents have had their patently rights terminated. Prohibits the state registrar, the department of child services, a county office of family and children, a licensed child placing agency, a professional health care provider, an attorney, and a court from releasing identifying information if the request involves an adoptee who is less than 21 years of age and whose name is on the list provided to the state department of health from the department of child services. Repeals a provision that allows an individual who submits a request for the release of identifying information to request the state registrar to search the death certificates for an adoptee or birth parent. Repeals provisions that are being replaced concerning: (1) requests for information concerning adoptees and pre-adoptive siblings; and (2) allowing an attorney, a licensed child placing agency, or a county office of family and children to charge reasonable fees for certain services and actual expenses. Repeals a redundant provision that: (1) allows the state registrar to adopt rules; and (2) requires the state registrar to prescribe certain forms.
Title
Release of adoption information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 191 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 645: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 400: yeas 48 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 3 (Lawson), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Placed back on second reading | |
2011-04-14 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-11 | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Representative Klinker added as coauthor | |
2011-02-10 | Senate sponsors: Senators Steele, Zakas and Broden | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Representative Welch added as coauthor | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment 1 (Foley), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment 2 (Karickhoff), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-02-08 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Representative Riecken added as coauthor | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |