IN HB1200 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
Pending: Senate Corrections & Criminal Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Human trafficking. Modifies the definition of "protected person" for purposes of the admission of a statement or videotape of an individual who is less than 14 years of age at the time of the offense but less than 18 years of age at the time of trial. Removes the requirement that money paid for a human trafficking victim or for an act performed by a human trafficking victim be paid to a third party. Increases the penalty if the human trafficking victim is less than 18 years of age. Specifies that: (1) consent by the human trafficking victim; or (2) a belief that the human trafficking victim was at least 18 years of age; is not a defense to a prosecution. Requires law enforcement agencies to report human trafficking investigations to the attorney general within 30 days after an investigation begins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseRepresentative Bartlett added as coauthor
2021-02-22HouseRepresentative Steuerwald removed as coauthor
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Crider and Donato
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Steuerwald, Olthoff, Negele
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1200/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/9/a/ae9af45a/HB1200.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/7/cd278aff/HB1200.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/7/f/7b7fdf0e/HB1200.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/6/6/bf66ef2c/HB1200.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/a/f/0faf5179/HB1200.01.INTR.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/8/f/218fb059/HB1200.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/d/b/28db1a88/HB1200.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/b/3/e2b36a24/HB1200.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/a/6/03a679e7/HB1200.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/d/8/2bd850cf/HB1200.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/8/c/8e8cfde3/HB1200.224_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback