IN HB1199 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Public Law 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Driving privileges. Provides that the bureau of motor vehicles (bureau) shall stay a suspension of a person's driving privileges, and terminate that suspension, upon a showing of proof of future financial responsibility, and provides that an individual whose suspension has been terminated because the individual submitted proof of future financial responsibility is not required to pay a reinstatement fee. Requires that the bureau terminate a suspension of a person's driving privileges if the bureau does not receive proof that financial responsibility is not in effect after 180 days. Provides that a suspension may be stayed and then terminated if a person fails to pay the judgment. Provides that a warrant may be issued for failing to appear in a traffic violation case if the charge is a misdemeanor or a felony. Provides that a person whose support obligation is enforced by the Title IV-D agency may have the obligor's driving privileges reinstated. Provides that the bureau shall place in forbearance license reinstatement fees of individuals who: (1) are nonviolent offenders; (2) have completed a criminal sentence or are serving terms of probation or parole; and (3) are enrolled in job training or maintain consistent employment for at least three years following completion of job training. Provides that the bureau shall waive all reinstatement fees and reinstate the driving privileges of an individual who has had reinstatement fees placed in forbearance after the individual maintains consistent employment for at least three years. Provides that the bureau, in collaboration with the department of correction, shall administer programs and activities to facilitate the reinstatement of driving privileges for convicted offenders not later than July 1, 2021. Extends the traffic amnesty program for one year to permit certain persons owing unpaid traffic fines, or who may be required to pay a fee for reinstatement of driving privileges, to obtain a reduction in the amount owed or amount payable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driving privileges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20HousePublic Law 86
2021-04-20HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-19SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 386: yeas 89, nays 0
2021-04-06HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-31SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-30SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateSenator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
2021-03-30SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-03-29SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2021-03-29SenateSenator Sandlin added as third sponsor
2021-03-25SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-23SenateSenator Charbonneau added as cosponsor
2021-03-23SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-16HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Young M
2021-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 93, nays 3
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-28HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Steuerwald, Pressel, Negele
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1199/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/b/0/09b07382/HB1199.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/7/e/097ef914/HB1199.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/0/e/420e4a24/HB1199.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/8/b/fe8b4f5b/HB1199.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/7/c/967c8589/HB1199.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/c/5/cac5c832/HB1199.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/2/7/e327e63f/HB1199.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/9/2/6f9252d8/HB1199.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/1/9/b7190f8c/HB1199.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/e/3/09e32642/HB1199.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/7/f/ea7f53c1/HB1199.06.ENRS.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/b/2/90b2edaf/HB1199.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/2/8/7028c8ad/HB1199.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/c/1/bfc10987/HB1199.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/c/2/53c22c8b/HB1199.02.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/4/c/014c7a21/HB1199.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/b/7/53b7460a/HB1199.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/7/b/2c7ba982/HB1199.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/5/6/5956eb6e/HB1199.03.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/9/a/a29a125b/HB1199.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/5/d/325daa4b/HB1199.04.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/f/3/f4f3a5b4/HB1199.05.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/8/8/d6887b09/HB1199.05.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/f/b/29fb7013/HB1199.05.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/f/0/dcf0d0a2/HB1199.05.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/4/7/89475b38/HB1199.06.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/7/9/0979bbc1/HB1199.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/d/1/a2d1219d/HB1199.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/f/e/86fe1af5/HB1199.138_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/f/d/f7fd6c4a/HB1199.03.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/6/d/9d6d67e8/HB1199.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/5/1/c851a98e/HB1199.289_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/a/9/d7a91b0e/HB1199.386_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback