IN HB1198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin and Tallian
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin and Tallian
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adult and juvenile court jurisdiction. Provides that a complaint, indictment, or information for child molesting shall be filed in adult criminal court if the accused person: (1) was at least 14 years of age but less than 18 years of age at the time of the offense; and (2) is at least 21 years of age at the time of filing the complaint, indictment, or information. Provides that under certain circumstances an adult criminal prosecution for child molesting must be commenced not later than one year after specified information is discovered if: (1) the accused person was less than 18 years of age at the time of the offense; and (2) the evidence was discovered before the accused person becomes 21 years of age. Provides that a court may suspend any part of a sentence for child molesting if the person: (1) was at least 14 years of age but less than 18 years of age at the time of the offense; and (2) was at least 21 years of age at the time of filing the complaint, indictment, or information. Requires a person who: (1) commits child molesting before the age of 18; and (2) who is charged as an adult after reaching the age of 21; to register as a sex offender, but permits a court to reconsider requiring the person to register at any time after the person completes court ordered sex offender treatment.
Title
Adult and juvenile court jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin and Tallian |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G |
2021-04-08 | House | House advisors appointed: Jeter, Negele and Hatcher |
2021-04-08 | House | House conferees appointed: McNamara and Pierce |
2021-04-08 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as second sponsor |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Young M |
2021-02-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 85, nays 8 |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2021-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Steuerwald and Negele |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |