IN HB1188 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 18 through 19 effective 03/18/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the secretary of state to adopt rules to establish research and development license plates for use by manufacturers of vehicle subcomponent systems. Sets a $20 fee for a research and development license plate. Requires the secretary of state to adopt interim written guidelines regarding the classification of research and development license plates. Revises language concerning the responsibility of the secretary of state related to vehicle dealer services. Exempts certain persons that buy or sell motor vehicles from the requirement of maintaining a bond satisfactory to the secretary of state by submitting to the secretary of state evidence that the licensee is a member of a risk retention group regulated by the Indiana department of insurance. Authorizes the bureau of motor vehicles to negotiate and enter into a reciprocal agreement with a foreign country to facilitate the exchange of operator's licenses and requires the bureau of motor vehicles to report annually to the general assembly regarding a reciprocal agreement. Specifies that all coverage available to a passenger of a motor vehicle under a motor vehicle owner's insurance policy must be exhausted before any other insurance coverage is available to the passenger.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various motor vehicle matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Sections 18 through 19 effective 03/18/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 15 through 17 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 14 effective 03/18/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 7 through 13 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 6 effective 03/18/2010
2010-03-25 Section 5 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 4 effective 03/18/2010
2010-03-25 Section 3 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 2 effective 03/18/2010
2010-03-25 Section 1 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 93
2010-03-18 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-15 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-11 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-05 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 284: Yeas 49, Nays 1
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 310: Yeas 96, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-03-02 Senate advisor appointed: Becker and Arnold
2010-03-02 Senate conferee appointed: Wyss and Rogers
2010-03-01 House advisors appointed: Fry, Davis and Saunders
2010-03-01 House conferees appointed: Austin and Neese
2010-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2010-02-22 Returned to the House with amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-11 Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
2010-02-11 Senator Arnold added as cosponsor
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs
2010-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss and Lanane
2010-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: Yeas 96, Nays 0
2010-01-25 Amendment 3 (Austin), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-25 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2010-01-11 Coauthored by Representatives Neese and Fry
2010-01-11 Authored by Representative Austin

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback