IN HB1181 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-26 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Youth offender boot camps and inmate calling services. Provides that juvenile offenders may not be placed in department of correction boot camps beginning July 1, 2022. Provides, for purposes of juvenile offenders who are already participating in the boot camp program on July 1, 2022, that the boot camp program expires December 31, 2023. Provides that a rate for intrastate: (1) collect calling; (2) debit calling; (3) prepaid calling; or (4) prepaid collect calling; in connection with inmate calling services shall not exceed the rate cap for the comparable interstate service, as set by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) and in effect at the time the call is initiated. Provides that this intrastate rate cap is subject to any distinctions in the comparable interstate rate cap set by the FCC that are based on: (1) the type or size of the correctional facility from which the inmate calling services call is placed; and (2) whether any site commission is sought to be recovered through the intrastate rate. Specifies that a provider that has been granted a waiver by the FCC from the interstate rate caps with respect to a particular: (1) correctional facility; or (2) contract for the provision of inmate calling services; is not subject to the intrastate rate caps for the comparable intrastate services provided to the same correctional facility or under the same contract. Prohibits a provider from charging an ancillary service charge for an intrastate inmate calling services call, other than those ancillary service charges permitted by the FCC for interstate or international inmate calling services calls at the time the call is initiated. Provides that a rate for a permitted ancillary service charge for an intrastate inmate calling services call shall not exceed the rate for the comparable ancillary service charge permitted by the FCC for interstate or international inmate calling services calls at the time the call is initiated. Specifies that a provider that has been granted a waiver by the FCC from the ancillary service charge caps for interstate or international inmate calling services calls with respect to a particular: (1) correctional facility; or (2) contract for the provision of inmate calling services; is not subject to the intrastate caps for the comparable intrastate ancillary services provided to the same correctional facility or under the same contract. Prohibits a provider of inmate calling services from impeding the completion of, or otherwise degrading, intrastate collect calling based on the lack of a billing relationship with the called party's communications service provider. Prohibits a provider from charging any taxes or fees in connection with intrastate inmate calling services calls, except for: (1) authorized fees; and (2) mandatory taxes and fees. Provides that: (1) authorized fees; and (2) mandatory taxes and fees; may not include a markup, unless the markup is specifically authorized by a federal, state, or local statute, rule, or regulation. Prohibits a provider from: (1) imposing a per call or per connection charge for any intrastate inmate calling services call; or (2) offering flat rate calling for intrastate inmate calling services. Provides that after June 30, 2022, a provider shall not enter into or renew a contract for the provision of inmate calling services at a correctional facility in Indiana unless the terms of the contract comply with these provisions. Provides that any term, condition, or provision that: (1) is included in such a contract; and (2) violates these provisions; is void. Provides that a provider that violates these provisions: (1) commits a deceptive act that is actionable by the attorney general or by a consumer under the deceptive consumer sales act (act); and (2) is subject to the remedies and penalties under the act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth offender boot camps and inmate calling services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-01-25HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Rogers
2022-01-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 93, nays 0
2022-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-18HouseRepresentative Jackson added as coauthor
2022-01-11HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2022-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2022-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative DeVon

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1181/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/1/2/2712db3b/HB1181.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/3/2/3932fb06/HB1181.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/2/7/fc27eb55/HB1181.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/7/e/8f7ed535/HB1181.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/d/7/c3d7d996/HB1181.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/f/3/52f38299/HB1181.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/b/e/19be07a6/HB1181.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/4/7/3347c19f/HB1181.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/f/6/1bf6d3e5/HB1181.01.INTR.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/c/7/0ac7a602/HB1181.76_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback