IN HB1180 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

PILOTS, charges, and fees on tax exempt property. Provides that a political subdivision may not do any of the following with regard to tax exempt property that is located in a tax increment allocation area and either: (1) was located in the allocation area before the designation of the allocation area and has been continuously used for a tax exempt purpose since the date the allocation area was designated; or (2) was donated for a tax exempt purpose: (A) Unless it is upon the request of the owner of the property, impose a payment in lieu of taxes (PILOT) or

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PILOTS, charges, and fees on tax exempt property. Provides that a political subdivision may not do any of the following with regard to tax exempt property that is located in a tax increment allocation area and either: (1) was located in the allocation area before the designation of the allocation area and has been continuously used for a tax exempt purpose since the date the allocation area was designated; or (2) was donated for a tax exempt purpose: (A) Unless it is upon the request of the owner of the property, impose a payment in lieu of taxes (PILOT) or

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HousePublic Law 200
2016-03-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 359: yeas 94, nays 0
2016-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 37, nays 8
2016-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-23SenateAmendment #2 (Kenley) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-23SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-22SenateSenator Hershman added as second sponsor
2016-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kruse
2016-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 94, nays 1
2016-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-13HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as coauthor
2016-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1180/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/c/e/f6cea2c1/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/4/e/454e1b4e/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/2/7/672766b7/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/8/7/7187de86/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/1/b/721bda32/HB1180.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/5/c/bd5caa73/HB1180.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/0/4/2104f1b3/HB1180.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/8/a/868a19b0/HB1180.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/3/b/713b89df/HB1180.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/3/0323ce35/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/0/f/200f3c44/HB1180.136.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/6/6/98662835/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/3/b/e83b7bbf/HB1180.223.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/8/9/09899550/HB1180.359.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback