IN HB1180 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes concerning the administration of the tax credit for natural gas powered vehicles. Excludes natural gas products from the definition of alternative fuel. Excludes alternative fuels from the definition of special fuel. Specifies that propane and butane are alternative fuels. Establishes an alternative fuel decal system. Provides that the road tax credit for motor carriers consuming compressed natural gas must be claimed on a quarterly basis. Makes numerous changes to the registration requirements for owners of commercial vehicles who register at least 25 vehicles that all have declared gross vehicle weights exceeding 26,000 pounds. Provides that the operator of a motor vehicle using compressed gas as a motor fuel is subject to the same nighttime operating requirements outside the corporate limits of a municipality as other vehicles and is permitted to carry flares or red-burning fuses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various commercial vehicle matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 118006 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 118005 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 118001 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 212
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 418: yeas 86 and nays 0
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 305: yeas 47 and nays 1
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateSenator Broden added as cosponsor.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-24SenateSenator Wyss added second sponsor.
2014-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Tax and Fiscal Policy
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs
2014-01-30HouseSenator Merritt added as sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-30HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 147: yeas 92 and nays 0
2014-01-29HouseHB 1180 Amendment #1 (Frye), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseHB 1180 Amendment #2 (Frye), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-27HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative McMillin added as coauthor.
2014-01-23HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor.
2014-01-21HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor.
2014-01-14HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Frye.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1180/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/3/3/9733758f/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/5/a/df5a11df/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/c/f/3ecf1d53/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/e/b/b4eb9128/HB1180.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/c/c/3fcc9f9f/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/3/0/52303df5/HB1180.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/5/5/4a5560f2/HB1180.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/b/3/25b34b8b/HB1180.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/e/c/5cec81e0/HB1180.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/f/c/7ffc8b3b/HB1180.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/6/1/456139a7/HB1180.06.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/b/1/65b1f20f/HB1180.07.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/e/6/e0e6000a/HB1180.06.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/7/0/0170b017/HB1180.07.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/f/d/c2fd4f2a/HB1180.08.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/7/3/a4730c21/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/a/c/7eac10f7/HB1180.03.ENGH.147.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/c/5/bfc56996/HB1180.05.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/f/2/fef27803/HB1180.06.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/1/c/091c6aad/HB1180.07.COMS.305.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/0/1/7a01061d/HB1180.07.COMS.418.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback