IN HB1180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that: (1) the statute concerning first lien mortgage lending; and (2) the uniform consumer credit code; do not apply to a bona fide nonprofit entity that does not operate in a commercial context and that meets other specified criteria. Makes a technical amendment.
Title
Zero interest mortgages by nonprofit entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 9 | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-03-30 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-03-29 | Senators Delph and Holdman added as cosponsors | |
2011-03-29 | Senators Zakas and Charbonneau added as cosponsors | |
2011-03-29 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Senators Steele, Mrvan, Simpson, Walker and Eckerty added as cosponsors | |
2011-03-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Head, Broden and Landske | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Representative Riecken added as coauthor | |
2011-01-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions | |
2011-01-10 | Coauthored by Representative VanNatter | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Clere |