IN HB1169 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requests the legislative council to establish a study commission on the topic of school discipline best practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School discipline.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-08 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-10 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-08 House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 374: yeas 88, nays 0
2012-03-05 Senate advisor appointed: Schneider and Rogers
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Kruse and Skinner
2012-03-05 House advisors appointed: Behning, Rhoads and VanDenburgh
2012-03-05 House conferees appointed: Koch and Porter
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-29 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-29 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 49 and nays 0
2012-02-27 Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor
2012-02-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2012-01-30 Senate sponsor: Senator Kruse
2012-01-30 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-30 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 72, nays 22
2012-01-27 Representative Frizzell added as coauthor
2012-01-27 Amendment 1 (Porter), ruled out of order
2012-01-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-25 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-23 Representatives M. Smith and Noe added as coauthors
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Koch

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback