IN HB1166 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State commission and board meetings. Provides that in order for the commission on Hispanic/Latino affairs to take action at a meeting, at least: (1) 11 members must be present; and (2) a majority of the members present at the meeting (instead a majority of members appointed to the commission) must vote in favor of the action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State commission and board meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 21
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 42, nays 2
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer and Tomes
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 93, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative Harris added as coauthor
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1166/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/f/1/b0f1e455/HB1166.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/a/4/5da4940d/HB1166.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/8/4/6684dcef/HB1166.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/5/5/3d55e0f6/HB1166.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/1/0/39100518/HB1166.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/5/0cc5ae34/HB1166.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/1/d/ac1d379b/HB1166.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/0/f/790f1279/HB1166.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/3/6/d63684ff/HB1166.51_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/7/1/1b71de47/HB1166.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/f/5/dbf58c67/HB1166.243_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback