IN HB1165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Study of farmland preservation. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of achieving farmland preservation in Indiana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study of farmland preservation. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the topic of achieving farmland preservation in Indiana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - Amendment #3 (Miller D) prevailed (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 166
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 620: yeas 87, nays 2
2019-04-23HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Glick and Taylor G
2019-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Leising and Lanane
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Clere, Baird, Deal and Goodin
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lehe and Bauer
2019-04-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-01SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 45, nays 2
2019-03-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Leising and Lanane
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-02-14HouseAmendment #3 (Miller D) prevailed; Roll Call 177: yeas 56, nays 34
2019-02-14HouseAmendment #2 (Bauer) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseRepresentative Deal added as coauthor
2019-02-11HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Clere added as coauthor
2019-01-29HouseRepresentatives Lehe and Goodin added as coauthors
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Bauer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1165/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/4/a/b74abd25/HB1165.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/c/9/2bc969e7/HB1165.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/d/c/e2dc195e/HB1165.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/8/c/de8c2beb/HB1165.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/e/8/c9e8976a/HB1165.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/d/e/d3dec034/HB1165.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/1/a/6c1a8ed2/HB1165.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/e/4/5fe44509/HB1165.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/3/9/e9391d14/HB1165.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/1/6/51164fdf/HB1165.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/2/2/dd225b70/HB1165.177.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/7/9/da794521/HB1165.188.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/7/4/407409e6/HB1165.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/1/5/98157c0b/HB1165.351.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/e/f/05efa22f/HB1165.620.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback