IN HB1163 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person who has a claim against the retainage or the payment bond of a contractor on a public works project must make the claim and deliver a copy of the claim to the contractor not later than stated times after that person performed the service or labor or supplied the materials for the public works project. Decreases the amount that may be withheld on state public works projects upon substantial completion to cover remaining uncompleted minor items. Makes stylistic and technical changes.
Title
Bonding and retainage in public works projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Arnold), failed (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 79 (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 2 (Arnold), failed (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 79 (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 335: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-02-14 | Senator Simpson removed as third sponsor | |
2012-02-14 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 38 and nays 12 | |
2012-02-13 | Amendment 2 (Arnold), failed; Roll Call 189: yeas 12, nays 34 | |
2012-02-13 | Amendment 4 (Banks), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-07 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Banks, Kenley and Simpson | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 92, nays 2 | |
2012-01-27 | Amendment 1 (Austin), ruled out of order | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Torr |