IN HB1153 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Committee report: do pass, adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Committee report: do pass, adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the question of approval of the constitutional amendment concerning marriage proposed by the 117th general assembly be placed on the 2014 general election ballot if the amendment is agreed to by the 118th general assembly. Prescribes the ballot language for the question. Describes the legislative intent of offering the constitutional amendment.
Title
Marriage amendment ballot language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 115301 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | House | Reassigned to Elections |
2014-01-14 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative Thompson |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Turner. |