IN HB1151 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School resource officers. Adds a school resource officer to the definition of "public safety officer" as it relates to the public employee benefits special death benefit fund (fund). Provides that a school resource officer qualifies for the fund if the school resource officer is not otherwise entitled to a line of duty benefit under the 1925 police pension fund, 1953 police pension fund (Indianapolis), or the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School resource officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 41
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 50, nays 0
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSenator Perfect added as second sponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Boots
2020-01-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-01-16HouseRepresentatives Klinker and Moseley added as coauthors
2020-01-16HouseAmendment #2 (Wright) motion withdrawn
2020-01-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative Frye added as coauthor
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Mayfield

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1151/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/a/7/9da7d220/HB1151.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/b/e/80be6d9c/HB1151.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/e/4/b5e498cb/HB1151.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/f/0/ccf0521e/HB1151.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/6/0/e9601a94/HB1151.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/e/1/98e161df/HB1151.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/c/9/35c93db8/HB1151.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/0/a/7a0a8810/HB1151.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/8/6/928601f5/HB1151.37_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/c/d/57cda3f9/HB1151.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/6/4/f664f123/HB1151.292_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback