IN HB1150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 165
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Monetary awards for exonerated prisoners. Defines "actually innocent" and specifies that a person whose conviction has been vacated and is actually innocent is entitled to compensation in the amount of $50,000 for each year that the person was wrongfully incarcerated in the department of correction or a county jail, subject to certain conditions. Establishes the exoneration fund (fund). Specifies that the criminal justice institute shall administer the fund and receive and process claims for compensation from the fund. Establishes a statute of limitations. Specifies fund eligibility requirements. Provides that a person's: (1) eligibility for; or (2) receipt of; proceeds from the exoneration fund does not prevent the person from applying for, enrolling in, or receiving the benefit of certain treatments, programs, or services if the person is otherwise eligible to receive the desired treatment or participate in the desired program or service. Provides that a person is not entitled to compensation in connection with the wrongful conviction: (1) if the person has previously received an award of damages in connection with the conviction; (2) while the person has a pending case; or (3) if the person does not execute a waiver. Specifies that the criminal justice institute may pay compensation only to the wrongfully incarcerated individual or to a guardian on behalf of the individual, and not to: (1) an estate; (2) a fiduciary; (3) a trust; or (4) an assignee; of the individual. Specifies that compensation from the fund is paid in equal sums over a five year period. Allows a person to appeal an adverse fund eligibility determination.
Title
Monetary awards for exonerated prisoners. Defines "actually innocent" and specifies that a person whose conviction has been vacated and is actually innocent is entitled to compensation in the amount of $50,000 for each year that the person was wrongfully incarcerated in the department of correction or a county jail, subject to certain conditions. Establishes the exoneration fund (fund). Specifies that the criminal justice institute shall administer the fund and receive and process claims for compensation from the fund. Establishes a statute of limitations. Specifies fund eligibility requirements. Provides that a person's: (1) eligibility for; or (2) receipt of; proceeds from the exoneration fund does not prevent the person from applying for, enrolling in, or receiving the benefit of certain treatments, programs, or services if the person is otherwise eligible to receive the desired treatment or participate in the desired program or service. Provides that a person is not entitled to compensation in connection with the wrongful conviction: (1) if the person has previously received an award of damages in connection with the conviction; (2) while the person has a pending case; or (3) if the person does not execute a waiver. Specifies that the criminal justice institute may pay compensation only to the wrongfully incarcerated individual or to a guardian on behalf of the individual, and not to: (1) an estate; (2) a fiduciary; (3) a trust; or (4) an assignee; of the individual. Specifies that compensation from the fund is paid in equal sums over a five year period. Allows a person to appeal an adverse fund eligibility determination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Public Law 165 |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 543: yeas 88, nays 2 |
2019-04-17 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 439: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senators Brown L and Tallian added as cosponsors |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Taylor G |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M, Mishler and Freeman |
2019-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment #3 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Porter, Thompson and Smaltz |
2019-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Steuerwald |