IN HB1143 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the House without amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Device implantation as a condition of employment. Prohibits an employer from requiring a candidate for employment or an employee to have a device implanted or otherwise incorporated into the candidate's or employee's body as a condition of employment, as a condition of employment in a particular position, or as a condition of receiving additional compensation or benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Device implantation as a condition of employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-18SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2020-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenators Crane and Niezgodski added as cosponsors
2020-02-17SenateSenator Young M added as third sponsor
2020-02-17SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
2020-01-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-14HouseRepresentatives Morris, Judy, Bartlett added as coauthors
2020-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Morrison

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1143/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/f/b/d0fb6e7a/HB1143.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/0/d/990d6ce4/HB1143.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/8/4/f784df9c/HB1143.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/e/c/dfecc669/HB1143.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/5/8/9458fa29/HB1143.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/f/5/0ff51aef/HB1143.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/b/8/bbb8f8f7/HB1143.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/5/8/30587d31/HB1143.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/c/e/9ace7c94/HB1143.35_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/e/5/0ee564dc/HB1143.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/9/2/87926702/HB1143.213_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback