IN HB1141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to apply for a state Medicaid waiver to reimburse providers who provide behavioral health services to committed offenders held by the department of correction. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to: (1) establish a plan to expand the use of certified community behavioral health clinics in Indiana; and (2) make certain considerations in preparing the plan.
Title
Mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-12 | House | Representatives Clere and Ziemke added as coauthors |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Vermilion |