IN HB1137 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Senate advisors appointed: Doriot, Stoops, Young M, Messmer and Buchanan
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Study of industrial hemp. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the regulation of industrial hemp and industrial hemp products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study of industrial hemp. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the regulation of industrial hemp and industrial hemp products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateSenate advisors appointed: Doriot, Stoops, Young M, Messmer and Buchanan
2018-03-07SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Randolph Lonnie M
2018-03-07HouseHouse advisors appointed: Smaltz, Judy, Friend and Taylor J
2018-03-07HouseHouse conferees appointed: Lucas and Wright
2018-03-07HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2018-03-07HouseMotion to dissent filed
2018-03-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2018-03-06SenateSenator Tomes added as cosponsor
2018-03-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 43, nays 6
2018-03-01SenateAmendment #4 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-22SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2018-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2018-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-15SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2018-02-13SenateSenator Messmer added as third sponsor
2018-02-13SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2018-02-13SenateSenator Head added as sponsor
2018-02-13SenateSenator Doriot removed as sponsor
2018-02-12SenateSenator Messmer removed as second sponsor
2018-02-12SenateSenator Tomes removed as third sponsor
2018-02-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2018-02-01HouseReferred to the Senate
2018-01-31HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Doriot, Messmer and Tomes
2018-01-31HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 90, nays 0
2018-01-30HouseAmendment #2 (Siegrist) prevailed; voice vote
2018-01-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-01-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-01-22HouseRepresentative Goodin added as coauthor
2018-01-22HouseRepresentative Judy added as coauthor
2018-01-11HouseRepresentative Eberhart added as coauthor
2018-01-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2018-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Lucas

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/house/1137/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/5/b/635bda8c/HB1137.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/2/4/a52497c0/HB1137.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/3/d/ca3d9606/HB1137.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/3/e/0b3ed778/HB1137.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/a/8/d9a88e5d/HB1137.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/5/1/b951e5e2/HB1137.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/4/f/754fa26f/HB1137.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/0/3/c103a0df/HB1137.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/5/7/7557fb56/HB1137.05.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/3/b/5/f3b527ca/HB1137.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/e/7/dbe7938b/HB1137.100.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/c/e/8bce4bdc/HB1137.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/5/1/51518238/HB1137.290.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback