IN HB1136 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Latch key programs. Provides that a school corporation may include children who attend preschool offered by the school corporation in a school age child care program (commonly referred to as a latch key program) conducted by the school corporation.
Title
Latch key programs. Provides that a school corporation may include children who attend preschool offered by the school corporation in a school age child care program (commonly referred to as a latch key program) conducted by the school corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] |
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Public Law 82 |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 471: yeas 69, nays 12 |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Melton added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 41, nays 9 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third sponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Grooms |
2017-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Amendment #2 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-07 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | House | Representative Klinker added as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | House | Representative Smith, M. added as coauthor |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Frizzell |