IN HB1127 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (1977 fund) to purchase at full actuarial cost prior service in certain public retirement funds.
Title
1977 fund purchase of service credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 70 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-25 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2010-02-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-22 | Senator Hume added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-15 | Senators Deig and Tallian added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Hershman and Lewis | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 143: Yeas 98, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | Representative Leonard added as coauthor | |
2010-01-26 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Goodin |