IN HB1126 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that: (1) a municipality that operates a water, wastewater, or combined water and wastewater utility; or (2) users of the utility's works whose property is located outside the corporate boundaries of the municipality; may petition the IURC under certain circumstances for review and revision of the rates and charges imposed by ordinance on the users. Requires the IURC to prescribe the form and content of the petition. Provides that a petition is dismissed and the underlying ordinance takes effect if the IURC does not approve or disapprove the petition within 120 days. Authorizes the IURC to adopt rules. Provides that certain requirements for trustees of a regional sewage district apply only to a district established in response to an agreed order entered into after December 31, 1982.
Title
Water and wastewater issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-14 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 360: yeas 45, nays 4 | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Rule 86(a) suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 408: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-03-09 | Rules suspended | |
2012-03-09 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Broden and Tomes | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Merritt and Randolph | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Wolkins, Lutz and Sullivan | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Frizzell and Pierce | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 41 and nays 9 | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 4 (M. Young), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment 3 (Merritt), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Senator Tomes added as third sponsor | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Bray | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Representatives Pierce, Lutz and Sullivan added as coauthors | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 93, nays 1 | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Frizzell |