IN HB1123 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that not later than December 1 each year, the office of management and budget shall submit to the state budget committee the following: (1) A report prepared by the office of management and budget concerning post-employment benefits and liabilities of state agencies. (2) Reports prepared by state educational institutions concerning post-employment benefits and liabilities of those institutions. Permits trust funds to be established to provide for prefunding annual required contributions to retirement funds and to cover other post-employment benefit liability for employees of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments, including employees of the state police department, conservation officers of the department of natural resources, and the state excise police. Provides that any modification to: (1) eligibility requirements; (2) required premiums; or (3) any other plan provisions; that increases the amount of the state's contribution to a plan of self-insurance established for the state police department, conservation officers of the department of natural resources, or the state excise police or that increases the post-employment liability under such a plan may not be made unless the modification is first approved by the budget agency. Provides for an annual review of the modifications by the state budget committee. Provides for a thirteenth check to certain members of the: (1) Indiana state teachers' retirement fund (TRF); (2) public employees' retirement fund; (3) state excise police, gaming agent, gaming control officer, and conservation officers' retirement fund; and (4) state police 1987 benefit system. Makes a state general fund appropriation for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2012, to cover the one-time thirteenth check for TRF retirees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public pensions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-09 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 344: yeas 50, nays 0
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 378: yeas 79, nays 2
2012-03-08 Rules suspended
2012-03-08 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau, Hume, Mishler and Boots
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Kenley and Tallian
2012-03-05 House advisors appointed: Neese, Cherry and Moses
2012-03-05 House conferees appointed: Burton and Niezgodski
2012-03-01 House dissented from Senate amendments
2012-02-20 Returned to the House with amendments
2012-02-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-02-16 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Senator Alting added as cosponsor
2012-02-13 Senator Becker added as cosponsor
2012-02-13 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 Senators Miller and Lawson added as cosponsors
2012-02-09 Senator Hume added as cosponsor
2012-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2012-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley and Charbonneau
2012-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2012-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 82, nays 2
2012-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-17 Representative M. Smith added as coauthor
2012-01-17 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-13 Representative Cherry added as coauthor
2012-01-09 Representative Neese added as coauthor
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2012-01-09 Authored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback