IN HB1119 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of pesticide use and application. Makes changes to the statute governing the state chemist's authority to impose civil penalties for purposes of the law concerning pesticides, pesticide use, and pesticide application. Provides that the changes to the state chemist's imposition of civil penalties do not apply to the imposition of a civil penalty pursuant to a proceeding of the state chemist initiated before July 1, 2020.
Title
Regulation of pesticide use and application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-23 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Leising |
2020-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Lehe |