IN HB1117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that if a not-for-profit sewer utility (utility) uses eminent domain to acquire an easement or right-of-way, the easement or right-of-way may not exceed 50 feet. Specifies that the following are not a not-for-profit utility: (1) A conservancy district. (2) For certain purposes, a utility owned, operated, or held in trust by a consolidated city. (3) A regional water, sewage, or solid waste district (district). Requires notice and a hearing before a petition may be filed to establish a district. Establishes requirements for appointment to the board of trustees of a district. Provides that a district or utility may not require a property owner to connect to the district's or utility's sewer system under certain conditions for ten years. Allows the property owner to apply for two five year extensions. Limits to $100 the daily penalty for failing to connect to a sewer system. Provides that if a district uses a flat charge to determine a rate or charge for a sewage works, the district must provide a written summary of how the flat charge was calculated. Allows a campground or youth camp to be billed for sewage service at a flat rate or by installing a meter to measure the actual amount of sewage. Provides that, for billing purposes, a bed at a youth camp equals 1/8 residential equivalent unit. Establishes a procedure by which a ratepayer may object to initial rates and charges established by a district. Provides that sewer lien that is the only lien on a property may not be foreclosed. Requires a health officer to verify the existence of unlawful conditions that transmit, generate, or promote disease before ordering their abatement. Provides that a person who provides false information to a health officer commits a Class C infraction. Requires a local health department to notify an applicant for a residential septic system permit of the existence of a district. Provides that a homeowner may include in a residential sales disclosure form information relating to a district.
Title
Regional water, sewage, or waste districts and utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 359: yeas 62, nays 30 | |
2012-03-05 | Senate advisors appointed: Leising, Breaux and Holdman | |
2012-03-05 | Senate conferee appointed: Gard and Tallian | |
2012-03-05 | House advisors appointed: Lehe, Baird, Knollman and Sullivan | |
2012-03-05 | House conferees appointed: Wolkins and Pierce | |
2012-03-01 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 33 and nays 17 | |
2012-02-27 | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 8 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 9 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 7 (Gard), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Gard and Leising | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 76, nays 20 | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (Wolkins), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative Lehe | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Wolkins |