IN HB1116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 218
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Property taxes.
Title
Property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 218 |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 598: yeas 79, nays 19 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 531: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2013-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Walker, Taylor and Hershman |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Head and Rogers |
2013-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Wesco, Candelaria Reardon and VanDenburgh |
2013-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Leonard and Porter |
2013-04-11 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 396: yeas 41 and nays 8 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Amendment 4 (Walker), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senator Walker added as cosponsor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Head |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 87, nays 8 |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment 2 (M. Smith), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 55, nays 39 |
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Representative Wesco added as coauthor |
2013-01-10 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2013-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Leonard |