IN HB1115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Tourism development. Expires the office of tourism development (office) on July 1, 2020. Modifies the office's duties and administrative structure and transfers the duties to the Indiana destination development corporation (corporation) after June 30, 2020. Establishes the corporation as a public body corporate and politic and an instrumentality of the state. Provides that the corporation is governed by a board composed of the following individuals: (1) The governor or governor's designee. (2) The president of the Indiana economic development corporation or president's designee. (3) Five members of the private sector tourism industry, appointed by the governor. Sets forth the corporation's powers and duties. Makes corresponding changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tourism development. Expires the office of tourism development (office) on July 1, 2020. Modifies the office's duties and administrative structure and transfers the duties to the Indiana destination development corporation (corporation) after June 30, 2020. Establishes the corporation as a public body corporate and politic and an instrumentality of the state. Provides that the corporation is governed by a board composed of the following individuals: (1) The governor or governor's designee. (2) The president of the Indiana economic development corporation or president's designee. (3) Five members of the private sector tourism industry, appointed by the governor. Sets forth the corporation's powers and duties. Makes corresponding changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePublic Law 78
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-08SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-04-02SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 370: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05SenateSenator Lanane added as third sponsor
2019-03-05SenateSenator Messmer added as second sponsor
2019-03-05SenateSenator Lanane removed as second sponsor
2019-03-05SenateSenator Perfect added as sponsor
2019-03-05SenateSenator Messmer removed as sponsor
2019-03-05SenateSenator Perfect removed as third sponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-11HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Lanane and Perfect
2019-02-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-02-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Clere, Bartels and Moed
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Karickhoff

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1115/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/d/b/3ddb5193/HB1115.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/a/6/1fa6e422/HB1115.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/a/e/94aef6e1/HB1115.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/e/e/abee1d78/HB1115.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/b/3/1fb327f5/HB1115.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/e/8/28e8f287/HB1115.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/2/3/97233d70/HB1115.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/f/0/d0f05d98/HB1115.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/b/5/b2b5bba0/HB1115.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/9/3/0993a0ff/HB1115.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/8/7/3a87c129/HB1115.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/f/4/29f400a1/HB1115.129.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/7/9/ad794d70/HB1115.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/4/01e42d9b/HB1115.370.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback