IN HB1115 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Public Law 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landowner immunity for trail access. Specifies that with respect to the statute that restricts a landowner's liability for an injury to a person or property caused by an act or failure to act of another person using the landowner's premises for certain recreational purposes, those purposes include another person going on or through the premises for the purpose of accessing a trail, a greenway, a park, or another similar area used for recreational purposes. Makes a technical change to include in the statute that lists Indiana Code provisions that: (1) are outside the Indiana Code title concerning civil law and
Title
Landowner immunity for trail access. Specifies that with respect to the statute that restricts a landowner's liability for an injury to a person or property caused by an act or failure to act of another person using the landowner's premises for certain recreational purposes, those purposes include another person going on or through the premises for the purpose of accessing a trail, a greenway, a park, or another similar area used for recreational purposes. Makes a technical change to include in the statute that lists Indiana Code provisions that: (1) are outside the Indiana Code title concerning civil law and
Sponsors
Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] | Rep. Wes Culver [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Public Law 29 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senators Buck and Koch added as cosponsors |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Ruckelshaus |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Representative Torr added as coauthor |
2018-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative Culver |
2018-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hamilton |