IN HB1113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 200
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Telecoil and beacon positioning systems. Requires the fire prevention and buildings safety commission (commission) to adopt rules requiring that a person performing new construction or any major alteration of an existing public address system in a Class 1 structure located in a first or second class city after June 30, 2020, must consider the installation of an audio frequency induction loop system (AFIL) and a beacon positioning system. Requires that the person performing new construction or any major alteration of an existing facility's public address system to solicit at least one bid for the installation of an AFIL and at least one bid for the installation of a beacon positioning system. Requires the commission to: (1) adopt standards of the American National Standards Institute (ANSI) and International Electrotechnical Commission (IEC) for installation, maintenance, and performance of audio frequency induction loop systems; and (2) develop standards for installation and maintenance of beacon positioning systems. Requires audiologists, individuals who hold a hearing aid dealer certificate of registration, and individuals who fit or dispense hearing aids while under the supervision and direction of an individual who holds a hearing aid dealer certificate of registration to provide information about telecoil and AFILs when fitting and dispensing hearing aids.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecoil and beacon positioning systems. Requires the fire prevention and buildings safety commission (commission) to adopt rules requiring that a person performing new construction or any major alteration of an existing public address system in a Class 1 structure located in a first or second class city after June 30, 2020, must consider the installation of an audio frequency induction loop system (AFIL) and a beacon positioning system. Requires that the person performing new construction or any major alteration of an existing facility's public address system to solicit at least one bid for the installation of an AFIL and at least one bid for the installation of a beacon positioning system. Requires the commission to: (1) adopt standards of the American National Standards Institute (ANSI) and International Electrotechnical Commission (IEC) for installation, maintenance, and performance of audio frequency induction loop systems; and (2) develop standards for installation and maintenance of beacon positioning systems. Requires audiologists, individuals who hold a hearing aid dealer certificate of registration, and individuals who fit or dispense hearing aids while under the supervision and direction of an individual who holds a hearing aid dealer certificate of registration to provide information about telecoil and AFILs when fitting and dispensing hearing aids.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Floor - (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 200
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 506: yeas 88, nays 0
2019-04-11HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSenator Zay added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Campbell added as coauthor
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Rogers
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2019-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Miller D

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1113/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/a/9/eca925ca/HB1113.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/f/e/7dfe46e3/HB1113.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/1/5/21157b5f/HB1113.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/3/c/143c1e47/HB1113.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/d/4/8ad47419/HB1113.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/d/f/7fdfebf5/HB1113.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/a/3/fca3f66e/HB1113.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/9/3/c39334d9/HB1113.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/2/b/462b25f8/HB1113.98.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/a/5/dda5e165/HB1113.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/b/e/d2bea02d/HB1113.398.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/f/9/4af9220a/HB1113.506.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback