IN HB1110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Annexation of residential development. Allows a third class city to annex: (1) a noncontiguous residential development; and (2) the right of way of a public highway connecting the development to the city. Provides that annexation is initiated by: (1) the homeowner's association board petitioning the city legislative body for annexation of the development; and (2) the city legislative body adopting a resolution approving initiation of the annexation process. Requires the city to satisfy statutory requirements for annexation including adopting a written fiscal plan and annexation ordinance and conducting an outreach program. Changes population parameters to reflect the population count determined under the 2020 decennial census.
Title
Annexation of residential development.
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Rodney Pol [D] |
Sen. Michael Griffin [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 70 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 309: yeas 86, nays 7 |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senators Pol and Griffin added as cosponsors |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 86, nays 6 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |