IN HB1110 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Small claims court procedures. Provides that a small claims court has jurisdiction over claims that do not exceed $10,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small claims court procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HousePublic Law 125
2021-04-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 417: yeas 81, nays 10
2021-04-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-07SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2021-04-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 50, nays 0
2021-04-06SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
2021-04-05SenateAmendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-17HouseRepresentatives Torr, McNamara, VanNatter added as coauthors
2021-02-17HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Baldwin, Garten, Messmer
2021-02-17HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 78, nays 19
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Bartels

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1110/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/c/2/9bc245ff/HB1110.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/8/2/7f821f9b/HB1110.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/9/3/9793672c/HB1110.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/d/8/48d85b60/HB1110.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/3/a/023abd78/HB1110.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/9/5/779546d8/HB1110.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/8/f/dd8fe6ff/HB1110.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/3/4/cc34df31/HB1110.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/b/d/70bdf337/HB1110.05.ENRS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/5/4/1a540f0d/HB1110.05.ENRS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/e/5/d1e5a713/HB1110.06.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/0/3/64032a92/HB1110.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/0/3/ff03707b/HB1110.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/3/7/9b3782ab/HB1110.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/a/6/83a653c3/HB1110.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/a/6/bda6bd20/HB1110.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/7/0/2570bc02/HB1110.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/c/b/56cb5b01/HB1110.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/d/a/82da6cf8/HB1110.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/9/9/3399bf15/HB1110.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/0/7/7107e8cd/HB1110.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/9/a/5d9accb4/HB1110.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/6/2/6862a931/HB1110.04.ENGS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/1/1/831190f4/HB1110.05.ENRS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/8/f/1e8fc77c/HB1110.06.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/2/2/a9223016/HB1110.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/4/8/6b48f7d0/HB1110.178_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/5/6/1d56c34c/HB1110.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/8/0/428098b4/HB1110.351_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/c/e/93cea42b/HB1110.417_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback