IN HB1109 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School funding and annual performance grants. Extends through 2018 the eligibility of school corporations to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately. Provides, with some exceptions, that if: (1) a school corporation in 2017 or 2018 issues new bonds or enters into a new lease rental agreement for which the school corporation is imposing or will impose a debt service levy; and (2) the school corporation's total debt service levy in 2017 or 2018 is greater than the school corporation's debt service levy in 2016; the school corporation is not eligible to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionally. Extends the date to January

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School funding and annual performance grants. Extends through 2018 the eligibility of school corporations to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionately. Provides, with some exceptions, that if: (1) a school corporation in 2017 or 2018 issues new bonds or enters into a new lease rental agreement for which the school corporation is imposing or will impose a debt service levy; and (2) the school corporation's total debt service levy in 2017 or 2018 is greater than the school corporation's debt service levy in 2016; the school corporation is not eligible to allocate circuit breaker credits proportionally. Extends the date to January

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Floor - (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23HousePublic Law 151
2016-03-23HouseSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2016-03-10SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2016-03-07HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 388: yeas 90, nays 0
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateSenators Kruse and Charbonneau added as cosponsors
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-02-29SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-29SenateAmendment #2 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-29SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-25SenateSenator Kenley added as second sponsor
2016-02-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2016-01-27HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-01-26HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Mishler
2016-01-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 96, nays 0
2016-01-25HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as coauthor
2016-01-25HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order
2016-01-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-11HouseRepresentatives Thompson and Errington added as coauthors
2016-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Huston

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1109/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/9/9c692810/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/b/f/3ebf5f53/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/1/f/641f5a9e/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/2/8/b5283b61/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/c/f/11cf4f94/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/8/7/1b87c7f7/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/5/8f256d07/HB1109.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/6/4/0964cd5f/HB1109.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/5/1/3b51cbf8/HB1109.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/d/c/e1dcff57/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/f/3/f6f3bb99/HB1109.31.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/1/a/991a6ef4/HB1109.65.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/3/3/ee33c9a7/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/1/f/d91fb63d/HB1109.259.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/a/2/b3a2d85c/HB1109.388.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback