IN HB1109 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Payment of monthly pension benefits. Provides that members and beneficiaries of any public pension fund administered by the Indiana public retirement system may receive monthly benefits only by direct deposit or another method approved by the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system. Repeals a similar but more narrowly applicable section concerning methods of paying monthly benefits to members and beneficiaries of the public employees' retirement fund and the teachers' retirement fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment of monthly pension benefits. Provides that members and beneficiaries of any public pension fund administered by the Indiana public retirement system may receive monthly benefits only by direct deposit or another method approved by the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system. Repeals a similar but more narrowly applicable section concerning methods of paying monthly benefits to members and beneficiaries of the public employees' retirement fund and the teachers' retirement fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions & Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-04HousePublic Law 127
2015-05-04HouseSigned by the Governor
2015-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-04-29SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-03-18SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2015-03-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 50, nays 0
2015-03-16SenateSenator Walker added as second sponsor
2015-03-16SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-03-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-02-24SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Pensions & Labor
2015-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-01-27HouseSenator Boots added first sponsor
2015-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 98, nays 0
2015-01-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-15HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor
2015-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Burton
2015-01-08HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2015-01-08HouseCoauthored by Representatives Niezgodski and Gutwein

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/house/1109/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/8/b/308ba297/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/1/0/5410b88d/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/2/a/112a9ccd/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/4/4/f/244ff731/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/1/1/f91143f1/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/0/8/1908c0fb/HB1109.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/6/a/da6a20f1/HB1109.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/8/5/3085a89b/HB1109.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/1/a/ec1a4913/HB1109.30.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/5/3/2e53ac1e/HB1109.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/c/4/7cc469c6/HB1109.300.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback