IN HB1109 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an identification document issued by the United States Department of Defense, a branch of the uniformed services, the Merchant Marine, or the National Guard that has no expiration date or an indefinite expiration date is an acceptable proof of identification for voting. Requires the bureau of motor vehicles (BMV) to put an indication of an individual's status as a veteran of the armed forces of the United States on an individual's license, permit, or identification card if the individual wishes to have the indication put on the license, permit, or identification card and provides proof of discharge from the armed forces. Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military service information on BMV documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-27 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-16 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-16 Public Law 118
2011-05-09 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-04 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-29 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-29 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-27 House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 681: yeas 97, nays 0
2011-04-26 Senate advisors appointed: Tomes and Paul
2011-04-26 Senate conferees appointed: Wyss and Arnold
2011-04-25 House advisors appointed: Borders, Dermody and Grubb
2011-04-25 House conferees appointed: Gutwein and Reske
2011-04-25 House dissented from Senate amendments
2011-03-15 Returned to the House with amendments
2011-03-15 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-03-14 Amendment 1 (Breaux), prevailed;
2011-03-14 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2011-03-10 Senators Arnold, Charbonneau and Schneider added as cosponsors
2011-03-08 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-02-17 Senator Zakas added as cosponsor
2011-02-17 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2011-01-20 Representative Grubb added as coauthor
2011-01-20 Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss and Paul
2011-01-20 Referred to the Senate
2011-01-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 95, nays 0
2011-01-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-13 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-01-11 Representatives Soliday and Reske added as coauthors
2011-01-06 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2011-01-06 Authored by Representative Gutwein

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback