IN HB1107 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a juvenile court may create a voluntary preventative program for at-risk children (program). Allows a court to appoint program staff and an early intervention advocate to implement, coordinate, and carry out the purposes of the program. Requires that staff and early intervention advocates who are likely to work with children to undergo a criminal history background check. Provides procedures for program staff and early intervention advocates participating in a program. Provides civil and criminal immunity to a person who: (1) requests that a child participate in a program; (2) provides information concerning a child to program staff or an early intervention advocate; or (3) participates in a plan for an at-risk child in a program. Specifies that, subject to the duty to report suspected child abuse or neglect, no information received under the program by staff or an early intervention advocate may be used against the child in a civil or criminal matter.
Title
Preventative programs for at-risk children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 183 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 714: yeas 99, nays 0 | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 508: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-20 | Senate advisors appointed: Lawson, Randolph and Glick | |
2011-04-20 | Senate conferees appointed: Buck and Lanane | |
2011-04-20 | House advisors appointed: Davisson, Rhoads and Klinker | |
2011-04-20 | House conferees appointed: Richardson and Bartlett | |
2011-04-20 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-12 | Representative Pryor added as coauthor | |
2011-04-07 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Senator Lawson added as third sponsor | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-05 | Amendment 1 (Lawson), prevailed; | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Buck and Lanane | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 97, nays 1 | |
2011-01-27 | Representatives Davisson and Bartlett added as coauthors | |
2011-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Representative Richardson |