IN HB1106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Public Law 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulated amusement devices. Provides that the department of homeland security (department) shall not inspect, and operating permits are not required for, certain regulated amusement devices. Provides that the department may perform an inspection of an exempted regulated amusement device only if a valid complaint or incident is reported to the department concerning the regulated amusement device.
Title
Regulated amusement devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Kendell Culp [R] | Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] |
Sen. Gary Byrne [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Public Law 80 |
2024-03-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 241: yeas 62, nays 29 |
2024-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Byrne) prevailed; voice vote |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 87, nays 9 |
2024-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Byrne and Garten |
2024-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2024-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Culp |
2024-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Aylesworth, Bartels, Cherry |