IN HB1104 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Law 134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adulterant and synthetic urine ban. Defines "adulterant" and "synthetic urine". Provides distributing synthetic urine or an adulterant with the intent to assist a person in defrauding a drug screen is a misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adulterant and synthetic urine ban. Defines "adulterant" and "synthetic urine". Provides distributing synthetic urine or an adulterant with the intent to assist a person in defrauding a drug screen is a misdemeanor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HousePublic Law 134
2017-04-24HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-20SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 427: yeas 94, nays 0
2017-04-06HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-04-05SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 369: yeas 48, nays 0
2017-04-03SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-30SenateSenator Taylor G added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Merritt, Charbonneau and Raatz
2017-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 91, nays 0
2017-02-21HouseAmendment #1 (Beumer) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-13HouseRepresentative Ziemke added as coauthor
2017-01-31HouseRepresentative Errington added as coauthor
2017-01-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2017-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative Beumer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1104/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/c/8/cac83112/HB1104.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/a/2/4fa210e0/HB1104.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/9/c/a89cad6e/HB1104.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/8/b/1c8b27b4/HB1104.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/a/8/70a831ca/HB1104.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/1/f/fb1f4d87/HB1104.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/c/e/19ce81bd/HB1104.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/0/7/5c07a1f1/HB1104.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/2/7/8027f70a/HB1104.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/0/0/de00be86/HB1104.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/c/8/0cc84f81/HB1104.196.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/c/b/41cb36e5/HB1104.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/c/6/12c6e9fc/HB1104.369.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/f/7/42f7403b/HB1104.427.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback