IN HB1102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "synthetic cannabinoid" and "salvia" (salvia divinorum or salvinorin A). Makes possessing, dealing in, manufacturing, or delivering a synthetic cannabinoid, or salvia equivalent to possessing, dealing in, manufacturing, or delivering marijuana, hash oil, or hashish. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Synthetic cannabinoids and salvia.
Sponsors
Rep. Kreg Battles [D] | Rep. Ralph Foley [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] | Rep. Vernon Smith [D] | Rep. Randy Truitt [R] | Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Rep. David Yarde [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 182 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 666: yeas 82, nays 0 | |
2011-04-19 | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 44 and nays 4 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Senator Steele added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Senator Skinner added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-01 | Senator Alting added as cosponsor | |
2011-03-01 | Senator M. Young added as second sponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-01-31 | Representatives Foley, Battles, Kirchhofer, Goodin and R. Frye added as coauthors | |
2011-01-31 | House Rule 106.1 suspended | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Head | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 99, nays 0 | |
2011-01-25 | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor | |
2011-01-25 | Amendment 1 (Dvorak), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-24 | Representative Truitt added as coauthor | |
2011-01-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Representative Yarde |