IN HB1099 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a municipality to annex property that is not contiguous to the municipality and is occupied by: (1) a municipally owned or operated wastewater treatment facility or water treatment facility; or (2) a police station of the municipality. Provides that if a municipality annexes such territory, the municipality may annex additional territory to enlarge the territory for the use of the wastewater treatment facility or water treatment facility only if the county legislative body approves that use of the additional territory by ordinance. Provides that certain municipalities may appeal an annexation on the basis that the annexed territory is not contiguous to the annexing municipality. Specifies that certain annexed territory may not be considered a part of the municipality for purposes of annexing additional territory and may not be considered a part of the corporate boundaries of the municipality for certain purposes under zoning laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation of noncontiguous property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 109904 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 109901 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-26HousePublic Law 207
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-05HouseMotion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 406: yeas 84 and nays 4
2014-02-27SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-02-27SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 256: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-02-27SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-25SenateHB 1099 Amendment #1 (Charbonneau), prevailed.
2014-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Local Government
2014-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-30HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 143: yeas 93 and nays 1
2014-01-30HouseSenator Charbonneau added as first sponsor.
2014-01-29HouseHB 1099 Amendment #2 (Niemeyer), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-09HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Local Government
2014-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Niemeyer.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1099/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/5/7/85571d06/HB1099.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/d/3/62d34af5/HB1099.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/1/c/401ce9a0/HB1099.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/a/1/e9a1f299/HB1099.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/b/9/89b941d1/HB1099.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/2/d/a92d1196/HB1099.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/d/2/49d2e5ad/HB1099.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/a/a/e0aaa4d8/HB1099.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/6/9/006908f5/HB1099.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/b/0/2fb0b314/HB1099.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/4/6/754624b2/HB1099.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/a/3/b6a36158/HB1099.06.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/6/5/76653852/HB1099.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/0/8/2b084dfc/HB1099.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/d/b/b5db98f6/HB1099.03.ENGH.143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/d/e/01de7c9e/HB1099.04.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/5/b/585bc212/HB1099.06.ENGS.256.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/7/f/9a7f7e8d/HB1099.06.ENGS.406.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback