IN HB1098 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study concerning uninsured motorists.
Title
Study concerning uninsured motorists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 63 |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 331: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senator Walker added as cosponsor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as cosponsor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second sponsor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-02-05 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Smith |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2013-02-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Representative Mahan added as coauthor |
2013-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2013-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Lehman |