IN HB1097 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 06/30/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the final report date and expiration date of the lake management work group from July 1, 2011, to July 1, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake management work group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 71 (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-16 Effective 06/30/2011
2011-05-16 Public Law 181
2011-05-10 Signed by the Governor
2011-05-02 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-28 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-27 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-26 House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 656: yeas 73, nays 0
2011-04-11 Returned to the House with amendments
2011-04-11 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 49 and nays 0
2011-04-07 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-04 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2011-02-17 First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2011-02-07 Senate sponsors: Senators Buck and Arnold
2011-02-07 Referred to the Senate
2011-02-07 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 96, nays 0
2011-02-03 Amendment 1 (Dembowski), ruled out of order
2011-02-03 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-01-24 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-12 Representative Dembowski added as coauthor
2011-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2011-01-05 Authored by Representative Dodge

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback