IN HB1095 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Returned to the House without amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contracts for emergency road repairs. Authorizes the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) commissioner to declare an emergency when a part of the state highway system has been damaged to the extent it is unusable by the traveling public or unsafe to use. (Under current law, the governor must declare such an emergency. Current law permits INDOT to award a contract for repairs by soliciting bids from at least three prequalified persons without use of the formal bidding process.) Repeals a provision that permits a contract to be awarded under such circumstances only if three bids are received and the lowest bid does not exceed the engineer's estimate to repair by more than 10%.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts for emergency road repairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-13SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-10SenateSenator Doriot added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Garten
2020-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 95, nays 1
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-15HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseRepresentatives Sherman D, Candelaria Reardon, Ellington added as coauthors
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1095/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/d/5/14d56f74/HB1095.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/f/e/e5feacb2/HB1095.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/6/b/786b5148/HB1095.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/4/9/5a496be5/HB1095.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/0/3/8503a6a3/HB1095.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/6/3/8e63eb2e/HB1095.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/a/8/30a8396e/HB1095.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/2/d/472dd0f9/HB1095.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/b/b/59bb087b/HB1095.59_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/7/1/0571dbbd/HB1095.02.COMH.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/9/1/4091e6c8/HB1095.205_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback