IN HB1087 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 198
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of motor vehicles omnibus bill. Relocates and modifies the following after expiration or repeal: IC 9-14 (Bureau of Motor Vehicles). IC 9-15 (Bureau of Motor Vehicles Commission). IC 9-16 (License Branches). IC 9-18 (Registration). IC 9-24-6 (Commercial Driver's License). IC 9-29 (Fees) (other than IC 9-29-17 (Fees Under IC 9-32)). Establishes limits for convenience fees charged by full service and partial services providers. Changes distributions of various fees imposed by the bureau of motor vehicles. Replaces chauffeur's and public passenger chauffeur's licenses with for-hire endorsements. Establishes refund procedures for fees imposed by the bureau of motor vehicles. Amends provisions
Title
Bureau of motor vehicles omnibus bill. Relocates and modifies the following after expiration or repeal: IC 9-14 (Bureau of Motor Vehicles). IC 9-15 (Bureau of Motor Vehicles Commission). IC 9-16 (License Branches). IC 9-18 (Registration). IC 9-24-6 (Commercial Driver's License). IC 9-29 (Fees) (other than IC 9-29-17 (Fees Under IC 9-32)). Establishes limits for convenience fees charged by full service and partial services providers. Changes distributions of various fees imposed by the bureau of motor vehicles. Replaces chauffeur's and public passenger chauffeur's licenses with for-hire endorsements. Establishes refund procedures for fees imposed by the bureau of motor vehicles. Amends provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Public Law 198 |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 404: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 436: yeas 69, nays 29 |
2016-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Representative Forestal removed as coauthor |
2016-03-09 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as conferee |
2016-03-09 | House | Representative Stemler removed as conferee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Crider and Rogers |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Yoder and Arnold J |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Frye R, Speedy and Forestal |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Soliday and Stemler |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Lanane) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Yoder) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Forestal added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Yoder and Arnold |
2016-01-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | Amendment #2 (DeLaney) ruled out of order voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |