IN HB1082 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Environmental rules and policies. Requires the department of environmental management (IDEM) to report annually to the legislative council: (1) any administrative rule adopted by the environmental rules board (board) or proposed by IDEM; (2) any operating policy or procedure instituted or altered by IDEM; and (3) any nonrule policy or statement put into effect by IDEM; during the previous year that constitutes a change in the policy previously followed by IDEM under the provisions of IC 13 and the rules adopted by the board. Provides that, if notice given by IDEM concerning a proposed rule identifies an element of the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental rules and policies. Requires the department of environmental management (IDEM) to report annually to the legislative council: (1) any administrative rule adopted by the environmental rules board (board) or proposed by IDEM; (2) any operating policy or procedure instituted or altered by IDEM; and (3) any nonrule policy or statement put into effect by IDEM; during the previous year that constitutes a change in the policy previously followed by IDEM under the provisions of IC 13 and the rules adopted by the board. Provides that, if notice given by IDEM concerning a proposed rule identifies an element of the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Pierce) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HouseVetoed by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2016-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 355: yeas 65, nays 30
2016-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2016-03-01SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2016-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 48, nays 2
2016-02-29SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2016-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-25SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-16SenateSenator Banks added as cosponsor
2016-02-15SenateSenators Schneider and Ford added as cosponsors
2016-02-15SenateSenators Perfect and Brown L added as cosponsors
2016-02-15SenateSenator Raatz added as second sponsor
2016-02-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2016-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2016-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
2016-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 64, nays 33
2016-02-01HouseRepresentatives Goodin and Baird added as coauthors
2016-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Pierce) prevailed; Roll Call 107: yeas 93, nays 0
2016-02-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-28HouseRepresentative VanNatter added as coauthor
2016-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2016-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Wolkins

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/house/1082/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/a/7/51a7e42a/HB1082.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/a/3/6ea3ecfd/HB1082.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/3/9/c739027e/HB1082.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/5/c/3b5c221f/HB1082.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/0/a/c70a18f8/HB1082.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/5/c/fe5c9e30/HB1082.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/0/9/64091e1c/HB1082.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/1/a/a31a4204/HB1082.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/f/c/e7fc7a2e/HB1082.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/9/8/b698bd84/HB1082.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/b/8/ddb8df44/HB1082.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/b/d/9dbd7a06/HB1082.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/8/3/8483b27b/HB1082.107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/1/c/c21c2fad/HB1082.121.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/f/c/54fc7a67/HB1082.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/e/0/6fe043d4/HB1082.255.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/f/5/69f5c8da/HB1082.355.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback